Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST PAUL, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1133979
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 February 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 February 2023 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window