Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST PAUL, CANTERBURY

Charity number: 1133979
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £166.25k £162.30k £218.56k £194.78k £224.14k
Total expenditure £178.37k £176.85k £197.21k £196.19k £197.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A