Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST PAUL, CANTERBURY
Charity number: 1133979

Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Harrison Sibson | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Samuel James Keeler-Walker | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Roslyn Newington | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Matthews | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Luck | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Lawson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Monica Walling | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Griffin | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
James Robert Sampson | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
Henrik Schoenefeldt | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Charles Keeler-Walker | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBINSON | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
John Paul Salmon | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
DAVID STUART | Trustee | 14 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ROSEMARY ANNE WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE PATRICIA CURD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DOREEN SYLVIA LAVEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.