Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BARNES

Charity number: 1134840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £486.26k £449.97k £474.36k £396.31k £413.63k
Total expenditure £504.63k £460.63k £438.08k £396.09k £445.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £17.05k N/A