TRINITY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WIMBLEDON) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a local congregation of the United Reformed Church, Trinity URC seeks to advance the Christian religion through its activities and the facilities offered to the community by its buildings, especially the Mansel Road Centre, a suite of rooms at the rear of the premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Merton
Governance
- 09 March 2010: Standard registration
- TRINITY URC (WIMBLEDON) CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jacob Bali | Chair | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Eric Chau | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Melrose | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Vivienne Wood | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Watson Rostron | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary McKay Bell Nicol aka 'May' | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Anne de Grouchy | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Guthrie Tulloch | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Trehearn | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel George Elliot | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jawdat - known as 'Dodie' Khurshid | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Napier Goodchild | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.56k | £207.07k | £344.00k | £347.50k | £334.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.81k | £311.26k | £394.50k | £306.92k | £327.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1971 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Reformed Church
Mansel Road
LONDON
SW19 4AA
- Phone:
- 02089469281
- Email:
- office@trinitywimbledon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window