THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, WINCHMORE HILL

Charity number: 1133942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £229.50k £227.87k £209.56k £275.20k £174.67k
Total expenditure £216.85k £217.25k £189.38k £203.98k £211.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.80k