THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, LEIGH, TONBRIDGE, KENT

Charity number: 1133968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY CHARLES DALBY Trustee None on record
Helen Hobhouse Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
James Edward Irving Trustee 11 April 2016
THE CHORAL FOUNDATION, THE CHAPEL ROYAL, HAMPTON COURT PALACE Received: On time
RICHARD THOMAS NEVARD Trustee 11 May 2015
THE UPHOLDERS CHARITY Overdue by 34 days
WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF UPHOLDERS, PETER JACKSON CHARITY Overdue by 34 days
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF UPHOLDERS NEVILLE HAYMAN CHARITY Overdue by 34 days
REV'D LIONEL WILLIAM GRAHAM Kevis Chair
LEIGH UNITED CHARITIES Received: 3 days late
THE LANCING COLLEGE CHAPEL TRUST Received: On time
CHARITY OF RICHARD CRANDALL FOR THE POOR OF LEIGH Received: On time
Julie Carol Porter Trustee 10 April 2017 None on record
James Benjamin Ward Trustee 26 May 2021 None on record
Sarah-Jane Hardy Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Mary Wynn Owen Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Ian Kenneth Vincent Trustee 14 April 2015
THE WARREN MEADOWS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Stephanie Rutherford Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record