Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES WITH ST PETER ISLINGTON

Charity number: 1134267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN BURNISTON Chair
None on record
Isabel Nisbet Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Rosemary Ross Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
Kerri Allen Trustee 07 October 2013
None on record
Hilary Roden Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
SINEAD BURNISTON Trustee 30 October 2011
None on record