Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, DEANE, BOLTON
Charity number: 1133864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR TERRY CLARK | Chair | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Partington | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andre Aderemi Adefope | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Clive Newton | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine McWilliam | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynn John Heywood | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antony John Tomlinson | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heath Francis Taylor | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev VINCENT CRAIG WHITWORTH | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Christine Joy Le Quesne Heywood | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRAUGOTT MARTIN GUNTER SPIELMANN | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Patricia Brockbank | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Walsh | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rutter | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
AILEEN MCDONALD | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GRIME | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY LANCASTER | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
BECCY CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHRYN CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE HAMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN SHEPHARD ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA MARIE SMALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.