Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN WITH SAINT ANDREW, CHELSEA
Charity number: 1132248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL DAWSON BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Asel Guillot | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
lilly Hastedt | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Cryer | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rhoda Hunter | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Louise Dare | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Barbara Ofori-Boateng | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Marc Stacey | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
BARBARA SHERWOOD | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SAMUEL OFORI-BOATENG | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ANDY MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.