THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES WEST BRIDGFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican Church in the Southwell and Nottingham Diocese
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Joseph Baker | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Ottway | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harold Dunford | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Joy Rooke | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Ruth Seabourne | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Che Royce Seabourne | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Poon | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Prentice | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Battrum | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Leigh Bolt | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon David Ayers | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harriet Hutchings | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lindsey Voce | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Donald Rhodes | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Robert Clarke | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ANN WALTERS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARGARET WHEATON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lane | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Hayman | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jude Hill | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Ferraro | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Martin David Crew | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.86k | £228.46k | £243.62k | £258.21k | £260.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.16k | £228.43k | £265.75k | £227.26k | £271.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 DUNSTER ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 6JF
- Phone:
- 07813499840
- Email:
- Admin@stgilesparish.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window