Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PHILIP'S, DORRIDGE WITH ST JAMES', BENTLEY HEATH IN THE BENEFICE OF DORRIDGE AND BENTLEY HEATH

Charity number: 1133831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £689.38k £535.71k £539.11k £434.73k £564.41k
Total expenditure £296.78k £293.45k £1.39m £2.93m £271.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £616.86k £495.42k £517.98k N/A £495.37k
Income - Other trading activities £58.81k £15.33k £2.42k N/A £50.15k
Income - Charitable activities £6.04k £6.25k £1.84k N/A £18.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £6.81k £16.98k £16.17k N/A £573
Income - Other £868 £1.73k £704 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £194.39k £0 £100.00k N/A £3.98k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £271.85k £279.96k £1.38m N/A £236.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.93k £13.49k £12.79k N/A £34.83k
Expenditure - Governance £1.38k £2.70k £2.04k N/A £2.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £33.79k £19.17k £14.70k N/A £21.50k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0