THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EARLEY ST. NICOLAS

Charity number: 1138037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £159.99k £188.10k £247.15k £212.09k £159.18k
Total expenditure £163.37k £167.41k £222.41k £214.60k £159.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.65k