THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EARLEY ST. NICOLAS

Charity number: 1138037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Pooler Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Peter Jeal Trustee 05 April 2019
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN IN HOSPITAL LIMITED Received: On time
Julie Lorraine Hull Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
ELAINE SPRATLING Trustee 12 March 2017
EARLEY CRESCENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
EARLEY VOLUNTEER DRIVER BUREAU Received: On time
Mary Jane Olney Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Wendy Neale Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Eleanor Gunbie Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Peter Kemm Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Rev April Cornelia Beckerleg Trustee 07 July 2020 None on record
EMMA LOUISE MAJOR Trustee None on record
DOUGLAS CONRAD WALROND Trustee 23 May 2021
1ST WINNERSH SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Julia Jones Trustee 15 September 2019 None on record
Jennifer Muriel Bryce Trustee 12 March 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Joan Fielding Trustee 05 April 2019 None on record