SOUTH HOLDERNESS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The South Holderness Methodist Circuit serves a group of Churches in East Hull and the East Riding of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £32,190 from 1 government grant(s)
People

33 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HULL (EAST) METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- SOUTH HOLDERNESS METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Deborah Margaret Lucas | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Christopher Greenfield | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HEWITT | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BEEVER | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MELANIE BRYANT | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD CRAWFORD | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Janet White | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE SPENCER | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CAROL SPENCER | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PARKER | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Steven Mark Clayton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Bryant | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Elizabeth Mary Richardson | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Edgar | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEACON SUSAN LANGDALE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Philip James Langdale | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew David Bettley | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Kathy Cornwall | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEWART HALL MBE | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Overvoorde | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Rachel Lesley Beastall | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Kemp | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS N D JEWITT | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS C M HUGHES | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR J MUNSON | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEOFREY PATRICK | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COX BA | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JEAN HOFF | Trustee | 19 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARY LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA ANNE LISTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA RAMSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA DYSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.11k | £214.71k | £230.24k | £208.68k | £203.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.61k | £220.92k | £225.28k | £190.85k | £224.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Holderness Methodist Circuit
882 HOLDERNESS ROAD
HULL
HU9 3LP
- Phone:
- 01482788728
- Email:
- public@shmc12.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window