BEWL WATER JOINT SCOUT AND GUIDE AD HOC COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1137098
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.11k £12.38k £7.66k £14.49k £17.77k
Total expenditure £11.49k £8.99k £9.82k £13.54k £11.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A