Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH
Charity number: 1133982

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin Nicholas Whitmore | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Brenda Farrell | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicholas Cross | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
John Frederick Mulvey | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Keith Raymond Dawson | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Leah Denise Sandford | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Simpson | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN ROSE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Briony Brookman | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Gwen Louise Wilkinson | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
COLIN JOHN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ISOBEL CAROLINE GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JULIAN EDWARD COTTERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JENNIFER MARGARET BEADLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
VIVIAN ATTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CHARLES THOMAS GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
NEIL MARTIN WILLIAM BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.