Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST AUGUSTINE WITH ST JOHN, KILBURN

Charity number: 1132507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window