THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR CHURCH, WARWICK AVENUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Church of St. Saviour Warwick Avenue is to promote the Christian faith within and beyond its parish boundaries by proclaiming the Gospel, by pastoral care and by liturgy. It cares for the church building which is made available not only for worship by other Christian groups but also by secular community groups. It hosts events for local schools and recitals and concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 21 May 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST SAVIOUR'S PCC, WARWICK AVENUE (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Webster | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Knowles | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gilbert Abou-Haydar | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
G BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.10k | £186.80k | £214.89k | £107.73k | £132.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.04k | £173.28k | £180.40k | £215.26k | £187.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 March 2022 | 497 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 December 2021 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 FORMOSA STREET
LONDON
W9 2QA
- Phone:
- 02077231968
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window