GREENFORD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertakes christian religious activities for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Cyprus
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Winning | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Dyce | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marsha James | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Adenubi | Trustee | 23 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Warren Ian McNeil | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARLEEN DONALDSON-HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROTIMI AWONIYI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.67k | £136.09k | £157.05k | £162.37k | £163.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.82k | £118.39k | £141.23k | £176.86k | £216.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 July 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 July 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEECHWOOD AVENUE
GREENFORD
UB6 9UA
- Phone:
- 02085755034
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window