Financial history THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE PRINCE AND PRINCESS OF WALES

Charity number: 1132048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.99m £7.83m £6.68m £11.78m £20.43m
Total expenditure £9.71m £9.08m £9.34m £9.16m £16.36m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £85.00k £50.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.85m £7.61m £6.61m £11.62m £19.95m
Income - Other trading activities £53.99k £116.15k £32.80k £140.27k £442.43k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £68.65k £98.53k £37.27k £10.11k £464
Income - Other £12.36k £1.09k £0 £50.60k £36.49k
Income - Legacies £1.64k £1.88k £0 £1.46k £183.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.28m £7.61m £8.16m £8.35m £15.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.43m £1.47m £1.19m £808.66k £1.23m
Expenditure - Governance £156.10k £176.06k £205.32k £135.12k £140.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.27m £4.22m £4.10m £3.73m £6.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £20.02k £21.01k £7.76k £4.91k £4.68k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0