Trustees THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE PRINCE AND PRINCESS OF WALES

Charity number: 1132048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rohinton Minoo Kalifa Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Jean-Christophe Gray Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record
Zeinab Mohammed-Khair Badawi-Malik Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Lord Hague of Richmond William Hague Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
Alice Webb Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
Claire Jessica Wills Trustee 27 June 2018
None on record
Simon Iain Patterson Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record
Lady Demetra Aikaterini Pinsent Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record