THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, REGENT'S PARK

Charity number: 1133861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sasha Kennedy Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Carole MacLeod Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
RUTH PEEL Trustee None on record
Griselda Brook Trustee 31 December 2015 None on record
PATRICK MINNS Trustee None on record
COLIN ROCHFORT LUKE Trustee 07 September 2011 None on record
Joseph Steadman Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record
ROSAMOND MISKIN Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR NEIL EDINGTON Trustee 15 August 2012 None on record
MR ALAN CAMERON Trustee 22 July 2013 None on record
COLIN LUDLOW Trustee None on record
SOPHIE ELIZABETH JENKINS Trustee 22 July 2013 None on record
Rev WILLIAM DOUGLAS FITZGERALD GULLIFORD Chair 15 August 2012
EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE Received: On time
Rebecca Grove-Stephensen Trustee 05 April 2017 None on record
MONA GRANT Trustee 07 September 2011 None on record