THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BROADSTAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of the Parish of Holy Trinity Broadstairs works in co-operation with the Incumbent, The Reverend B Dominic Fenton, in promoting the pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical mission of the Church of England in Broadstairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC BROADSTAIRS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rev Dominic Fenton | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MCGLADE | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CURTIS | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER MURPHY | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALEX BORG | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MURPHY | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Martin | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Baker | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Barrett | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Valerie Anne Bough | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Colyer | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally-Jane Stephenson | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Barrett | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Frances Margaret Lowden | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLOTTE MILLICENT BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.02k | £76.96k | £83.14k | £132.68k | £175.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.01k | £139.38k | £139.17k | £171.14k | £165.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Parish Office
Nelson Place
Broadstiars
CT10 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01843862921
- Email:
- holytrinity2009@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window