THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST ALBAN TEDDINGTON

Charity number: 1133919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download