THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST ALBAN TEDDINGTON

Charity number: 1133919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Chaperlin Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
MARGARET SQUIRE Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
SUSAN STEVENS Trustee 25 April 2017
INTEGRATED NEUROLOGICAL SERVICES Received: On time
MR FRED SQUIRE Trustee None on record
CARLA MAROUSSAS BA Trustee 30 May 2012 None on record
Hilary Adamson Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Alexandra Ruffen Trustee 27 April 2021 None on record
PETER CARDIGAN STEVENS Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Sarah Rae Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
NICHOLAS STRHAN Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
PAUL TYRRELL HAMMOND RIBA Trustee None on record
MALCOLM JOHN EADY Trustee
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS Received: On time
JENNIFER MARGARET PAYNTER Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
James David Power Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
MARY ADA HAWES Trustee 30 May 2012
GODLY PLAY UK Received: On time
KRYSTYNA SMITH Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
COL ROBIN ANTHONY FIELD-SMITH MBE Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
KATHERINE MATTHEWS Trustee 28 April 2015 None on record
SARAH WILLIAMS Trustee 28 April 2015 None on record
REV JOE MOFFATT Chair
TEDDINGTON MISSION HUB Recently registered
ACTIVATE SPORTS MINISTRY Recently registered
Anthony Paul Cooper Trustee 27 April 2021 None on record
SUZIE GORDON Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Sidony Olivia Kennan Trustee 27 April 2021 None on record
CAROLINE ELIZABETH HALMSHAW Trustee 30 July 2013 None on record
Kathryn Pamela Cassidy Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record