CHASE NC LTD

Charity number: 1137591
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.35k £34.35k £55.15k £112.78k £65.59k
Total expenditure £23.87k £23.87k £40.86k £64.68k £74.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £19.11k N/A