CHASE NC LTD

Charity number: 1137591

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MONICA LINDSAY Trustee 01 April 2015
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time
Rev ANTHONY GILES Trustee 01 October 2015
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time
SAMUEL EDEN CHARITY Received: On time
TREVOR FARMER Trustee 09 August 2018
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time
Robert Bird Trustee 13 July 2017
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time
Sheila Jones Trustee 04 February 2021
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time
GRANT EVERITT Trustee 01 April 2015
ST ANNS ADVICE GROUP Received: On time