SADAQUAT SOCIAL & WELFARE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1135506
Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 691 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 691 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1056 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1056 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1421 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1421 days
Annual return 30 September 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1786 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1786 days