THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CLAYTON

Charity number: 1134841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Susan Hamilton Trustee 04 April 2018 None on record
Penelope Marion Silson Trustee 04 April 2018 None on record
Angela Smith Trustee 15 March 2020 None on record
David Evans Trustee 15 March 2020 None on record
Rev VAUGHAN POLLARD Chair 29 October 2012
CLAYTON ESTATE COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP Received: On time
Pat Harrington Trustee 04 April 2018 None on record
Rachel Rhodes Trustee 04 August 2018 None on record
JOHN CHARLES LYNCH Trustee None on record
BRIAN HORSFALL Trustee
BRADFORD STREET ANGELS Received: On time
Tim Russell Trustee 30 May 2021
FRANK WALLIS SCHOLARSHIP Received: On time
MRS PAM COLES Trustee None on record
Rachel Wilkinson Trustee 30 May 2021 None on record
David Fox Trustee 04 April 2018 None on record