PCC of Birstall Parish Church in the Diocese of Leeds

Charity number: 1133854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 August 2017 On time Download