PCC of Birstall Parish Church in the Diocese of Leeds

Charity number: 1133854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.14k £87.31k £95.47k £98.05k £90.83k
Total expenditure £90.84k £93.97k £78.54k £89.51k £93.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A