THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN'S, BEN RHYDDING

Charity number: 1133844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER WILLOX BSc Chair 30 October 2013
GIVE A CHILD A HOPE Received: On time
CTI 2000 Received: 52 days late
OTLEY CHRISTIAN RESOURCES HUB Received: 129 days late
Charles Edward Jenkins Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
LYNN HAYGARTH Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
KATHLEEN BALFOUR Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
SYLVIA CONSTANCE WALKER Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
Margaret Beatham Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
AMY STIDWORTHY Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
NIKKI GIBSON Trustee 11 April 2016 None on record
Kathleen Hannam Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
REV JAN COPSEY Trustee 20 September 2013 None on record
WILLIAM MARWICK Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
DAWN JENKINS Trustee 12 September 2016 None on record
Andrew Rayment Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Miranda Armitage Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
KAREN JAYNE OXTOBY Trustee 11 April 2016 None on record