Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRISTLETON
Charity number: 1133992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair David Holland | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Morgan | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Powell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Norbury | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lightfoot | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stefan John Collier | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH SMALLS | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Inall | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joce Platel | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann White | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PATRICIA LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Liz McClure | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH ROSE GILLIATT | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.