Financial history UNION OF MUSLIM ORGANISATIONS WALSALL

Charity number: 1137192
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.45k £5.27k £5.40k £10.92k £32.57k
Total expenditure £3.74k £3.32k £746 £8.87k £21.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.80k