Trustees BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV DR DAVID MICHAEL CHAPMAN Chair 24 August 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
SHARED CHURCHES (HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Chris Sandy Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
JENNIFER KAY HARRIS Trustee 19 September 2020
WEST HERTFORDSHIRE AND BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev ROSEMARY JANE FLETCHER Trustee 01 September 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH, HATFIELD ROAD, ST ALBANS
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH, POTTERS BAR
Received: On time
MARLBOROUGH ROAD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 273 days late
SHARED CHURCHES (HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
ST ALBANS AND WELWYN METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 14 days late
FUND FOR HUMAN NEED
Received: On time
Lynne LING Trustee 01 September 2019
BISHOP'S STORTFORD CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Recently registered
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN FRISWELL Trustee 29 January 2018
DOWNHAM MARKET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MARION DOROTHY MEAR Trustee 02 January 2018
None on record
Rev Mark Paul Hammond Trustee 16 September 2017
WEST HERTFORDSHIRE AND BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
HARPENDEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SOUTHDOWN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Tom Osborne Trustee 16 September 2017
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH, CLACTON
Received: On time
TENDRING METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev ANDREW JAMES LESTER HOLLINS Trustee 16 September 2017
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BEDFORDSHIRE
Overdue by 1658 days
PUTNOE HEIGHTS CHURCH
Recently registered
THE NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Kathy Burrell Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Rev MALCOLM PEACOCK BSc MA Trustee 13 January 2014
The Methodist Church - Letchworth Garden City
Received: On time
NORTH HERTS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
KEITH NORMAN Trustee 13 January 2014
RAYLEIGH CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES TRUST
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
BAR-N-BUS TRUST
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH SOUTHEND AND LEIGH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
DAVID ALAN GERMANY Trustee 21 September 2013
THE NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Mr Bob Butcher Trustee
None on record