Trustees HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

29 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER COTTERRELL Trustee 01 May 2021
NATIONAL JAZZ ARCHIVE
Received: On time
THE NATIONAL JAZZ ARCHIVE
Recently registered
Michael Hustler Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Sallie Choate Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Miriam Hazeley-Wilson Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
David Thompson Trustee 20 May 2020
None on record
Sarah Naomi Thompson Trustee 20 May 2020
None on record
Allison Marie Nau Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
ANNA ELIZABETH TWOMLOW Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
Megan Morgan Wells Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
DEACON BELINDA SHIRLEY LETBY Trustee 01 September 2019
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
EMERSON RIZZI Trustee 01 September 2019
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN CARROLL BRIERLEY Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
HANNAH BROWN Trustee 07 July 2019
None on record
HELEN KAY CORNICK Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
MADALENA REBECCA MILLARD FERREIRA LEAO Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Rev PETER JOHN CORNICK Trustee 01 September 2018
KING'S CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ALAN JAMES BROOKS Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
ALETHEA CHIA JUNG SIOW Trustee 29 April 2018
WEST LONDON MISSION HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Richard Stone Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
MARY HICKS Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
His Honour JOHN HICKS LLM QC Trustee 02 April 2016
None on record
Rev JAMES ALAN CRUDDAS Trustee 01 December 2014
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BRENDA DOKU Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
MARGARET RUDLAND Trustee 19 June 2012
None on record
EDNA WIJERATNA Trustee 18 June 2012
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
CAROLINE ELIZABETH KEATING CROSS Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
RICHARD SHEPLEY Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
CATHY SLATER Trustee
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
GORDON SLATER Trustee
None on record