Financial history AESOP ARTS AND SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1134572
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £738.70k £863.67k £404.01k £565.69k £427.26k
Total expenditure £628.09k £837.87k £561.56k £432.08k £490.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £55.00k £89.74k
Income from government grants £10.50k £40.35k £37.50k £55.85k £83.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £435 N/A £530.53k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £7.87k £28.36k N/A £35.16k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £730.83k £834.87k N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £628.09k £837.87k N/A £432.08k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.45k £10.29k N/A £10.37k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A