Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST
Charity number: 1134439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND RODNEY GRANVILLE DREYER | Chair |
|
||||||
Ann Henderson | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Julian van Kan | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Diane Ma | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ringer | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Lindop | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Nana Twym-Ampofo | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Kwame Appiah-Peprah | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Cooper | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Gewndolee Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER MURRAY WYLLIE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Mrs Liz Hatcher | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jones | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
FELICITY MARY ROBINSON | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|||||
LYNN PATRICIA MANSELL | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|||||
KENT GRAHAM HARRIES | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|||||
ALISON PATRICIA PARSONS | Trustee |
|
||||||
IRENE POOLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBIN CROWTHER | Trustee |
|
||||||
SANDRA ROSALIND DREYER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.