Tredegar Park Ministry Area

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newport City
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Standard registration
- RECTORIAL BENEFICE OF BASSALEG PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Orton Cooke KC | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Lynbeck | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Miller | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Wickens | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Kennedy | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERESA ANNE CARVER | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Matthews | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
HILARY GEORGE CARVER | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Anthony Reese | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Diane Barton | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lynn Carey | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gail Margaret Carey | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kay Rogers | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHERYLL ELIZABETH JEFFREYS | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GEOFFREY NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV CHRIS STONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LEE MORGAN BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHLEY GEORGE ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN LOUISE ANTONELLI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.66k | £128.42k | £92.25k | £91.48k | £178.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.60k | £110.47k | £115.04k | £151.72k | £198.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 11 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Church View
Caerphilly Road
Bassaleg
Newport
NP10 8ND
- Phone:
- 01633378354
- Email:
- vicchris78@sky.com
- Website:
-
bassalegbenefice.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window