Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS AND ST EDMUND SALISBURY
Charity number: 1133882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kelvin Inglis | Chair | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Elliott Broadley | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian McInnes Sharpe | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Frederick Horwood | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Fiona Hulbert | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Tawney | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Laughton | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ali Alexander | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Herbert John Ledingham | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Lillias Berenice Elliott | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ledingham | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Selena Deacon | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Humphreys | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lewis | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Heier | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Green | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Wendy Eileen Cooper | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Amanda Chettleburgh | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Oliver | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.