CACH-ALL

Charity number: 1135276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £41.09k £39.34k £32.72k £33.03k £31.67k
Total expenditure £41.79k £32.19k £40.10k £32.47k £32.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A