THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS, BARNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Taking of religious assemblies in schools and running regular services for local schools. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings and the discussion of literature. Promoting the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,109 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS PCC, BARNES (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Anne Reed-Boswell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhodri Havard Walters CB | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Louise Tillyard Harries | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Fiddes Houlder | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Johnstone | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Marie Waller | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Anderson Murray Curran | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Hackett-Brown | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Appleby | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN FRANCIS STAVROU | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE BENNETT-POWELL | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Russell | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.32k | £231.84k | £215.49k | £282.20k | £311.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.83k | £211.98k | £195.96k | £247.04k | £298.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
39 Elm Bank Gardens
Barnes
LONDON
SW13 0NX
- Phone:
- 02088765230
- Email:
- admin@stmichaelbarnes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window