THE LEARNING AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1136846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 June 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 June 2021 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 June 2021 755 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 June 2021 1119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required