Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, SOUTHBROOM, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1134059
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £189.88k £178.42k £179.60k £379.17k £357.76k
Total expenditure £170.12k £176.44k £169.24k £181.95k £354.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.70k £1.70k £7.13k N/A