HACKNEY AFRICAN FORUM

Charity number: 1135936
Charity reporting is overdue by 1756 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 295 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 660 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 660 days
Annual return 31 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1026 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1026 days
Annual return 31 May 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1391 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1391 days
Annual return 31 May 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1756 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1756 days