WAKEFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £112.41k £84.76k £126.82k £118.15k £100.52k
Total expenditure £95.52k £114.39k £122.32k £119.78k £141.75k
Income from government contracts £19.81k £0 £19.74k £19.74k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.00k