WAKEFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elham Khassafi Trustee 16 July 2020 None on record
ANDREW WILLIS Trustee 20 October 2011
CROSS PROJECT Received: On time
Vivienne Jayne Rowden Trustee 15 September 2019 None on record
Susan Jane Phillips Trustee 20 May 2018 None on record
Kezia Samantha Adele Robinson Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Melanie Angela Neale Trustee 20 May 2018 None on record
Flora Catherine Davies Trustee 21 May 2017 None on record
David Andrew Taylor Trustee 21 May 2017 None on record