Accounts and annual returns OPERA NOVA

Charity number: 1138924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required