Financial history CHIVERS COTON WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity number: 1135325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.96k £23.43k £24.35k £21.82k £24.68k
Total expenditure £34.87k £42.13k £29.04k £28.49k £29.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A